+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (7)
On November 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Approved P.L.2021, c.300.
On June 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (40-0)
- Substituted for S3041 (2R)
On April 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
On March 25, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Passed by the Assembly (72-0-0)
On January 13, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
On October 22, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Introduced, Referred to Assembly Aging and Senior Services Committee
+ − Votes (4)
June 21, 2021: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 40
June 21, 2021: SUB FOR S3041
- Present/NV: 40
March 25, 2021: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 72
- Present/NV: 7
January 13, 2021: r/Aca
- Yeas: 6
+ − Sponsors (20)
Type:
Primary Sponsor