+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (8)
On January 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Approved P.L.2020, c.150.
On November 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (39-0)
- Substituted for S3011
On November 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
On October 29, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Passed by the Assembly (72-0-0)
On October 26, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
On October 22, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
On October 19, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
+ − Votes (4)
November 16, 2020: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
November 16, 2020: SUB FOR S3011
- Present/NV: 40
October 29, 2020: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 72
- Present/NV: 8
October 26, 2020: r/favorably
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor