+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (8)
On December 4, 2020 in the Senate:
- Approved P.L.2020, c.131.
On November 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (39-0)
- Substituted for S3063 (1R)
- Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
On November 16, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Passed by the Assembly (74-0-0)
On November 12, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
On October 22, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
On October 19, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
+ − Votes (4)
November 16, 2020: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 74
- Present/NV: 6
November 16, 2020: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
November 16, 2020: SUB FOR S3063
- Present/NV: 40
November 12, 2020: r/Aca
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor