+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (14)
On December 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Approved P.L.2021, c.325.
On December 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (39-0)
- Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading - Concur. w/Gov's Recom.
On December 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Passed by the Assembly (76-0-0)
On November 8, 2021 in the Assembly:
- 2nd Reading in the Assembly on Concur. w/Gov.'s Recommend.
- First Reading/Governor Recommendations Only
- Conditional Veto, Received in the Assembly
On June 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (38-0)
- Substituted for S3474
On May 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
On March 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
On March 1, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Passed by the Assembly (70-0-0)
On January 13, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
On October 19, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Introduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
+ − Votes (7)
December 20, 2021: CONCUR GOV REC
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
December 20, 2021: CONCUR GOV REC
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 4
June 3, 2021: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
June 3, 2021: SUB FOR S3474
- Present/NV: 40
May 13, 2021: r/favorably
- Yeas: 5
March 1, 2021: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 70
- Present/NV: 10
January 13, 2021: r/favorably
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor