+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (10)
On May 12, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Approved P.L.2021, c.98.
On March 25, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (72-0-0)
- Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed by the Senate (35-0)
- Substituted for S3169 (SCS)
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
On November 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
On October 29, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Passed by the Assembly (72-0-0)
On October 22, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Reported from Assembly Comm. as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
On October 8, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
+ − Votes (6)
March 25, 2021: CONCUR IN SA
- Yeas: 72
- Present/NV: 7
March 25, 2021: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 35
- Present/NV: 5
March 25, 2021: SUB FOR S3169
- Present/NV: 40
February 11, 2021: r/Sca
- Yeas: 5
October 29, 2020: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 72
- Present/NV: 8
October 21, 2020: r/ACS
- Yeas: 10
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor