+ − Full Texts (11)
+ − Actions (11)
On December 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Amendment (22-0) (Turner)
On June 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Amendment (22-0) (Turner)
On April 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
On March 25, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Passed by the Assembly (44-25-3)
On March 17, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Reported from Assembly Comm. as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
- Recommitted to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
On March 1, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)
On October 26, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
On October 22, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Transferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
On October 19, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Transferred to Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee
On September 17, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
+ − Votes (5)
December 2, 2021: 2ND READING
- Present/NV: 40
December 2, 2021: AMEND
- Yeas: 22
- Present/NV: 18
March 25, 2021: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 44
- Nays: 25
- Present/NV: 7
March 17, 2021: r/ACS
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
October 26, 2020: r/Aca
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor