+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (8)
On December 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Approved P.L.2020, c.146.
On November 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (28-9)
- Substituted for S2597
On November 5, 2020 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
On October 29, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Passed by the Assembly (49-21-0)
On October 26, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
On October 8, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
On August 25, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Introduced, Referred to Assembly Oversight, Reform and Federal Relations Committee
+ − Votes (4)
November 16, 2020: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 3
November 16, 2020: SUB FOR S2597
- Present/NV: 40
October 29, 2020: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 49
- Nays: 21
- Present/NV: 10
October 26, 2020: r/favorably
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor