+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (10)
On November 8, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Approved P.L.2021, c.295
On June 24, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (72-0-3)
On March 25, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed by the Senate (36-0)
- Substituted for S3131 (1R)
On February 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
On November 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
On November 16, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Passed by the Assembly (70-1-3)
On October 19, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
On August 13, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
+ − Votes (6)
June 24, 2021: CONCUR IN SA
- Yeas: 72
- Present/NV: 5
March 25, 2021: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 36
- Present/NV: 4
March 25, 2021: SUB FOR S3131
- Present/NV: 40
February 11, 2021: r/Sca
- Yeas: 5
November 16, 2020: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 70
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 6
October 19, 2020: r/Aca
- Yeas: 12
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor