+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (12)
On January 4, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly
On November 16, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (74-0-0)
- Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
On November 16, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed by the Senate (39-0)
- Substituted for S3128 (1R)
On November 12, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
- Transferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
On October 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
On September 24, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Passed by the Assembly (79-0-0)
On September 17, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
On September 14, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Transferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
On August 13, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture Committee
+ − Votes (6)
November 16, 2020: CONCUR IN SA
- Yeas: 74
- Present/NV: 6
November 16, 2020: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
November 16, 2020: SUB FOR S3128
- Present/NV: 40
November 12, 2020: r/Sca
- Yeas: 12
September 24, 2020: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 79
- Present/NV: 1
September 17, 2020: r/Aca
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsors (27)
Type:
Primary Sponsor