+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (6)
On June 24, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Substituted by S2798 (4R)
On June 3, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)
On March 25, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)
On October 29, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)
On October 22, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
On July 20, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
+ − Vote
October 21, 2020: r/Aca
- Yeas: 13
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor