+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (6)
On June 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
On June 3, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Passed by the Assembly (51-21-0)
On May 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)
On May 18, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
On March 15, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Reported as an Assembly Committee Substitute and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
On June 25, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
+ − Votes (3)
June 3, 2021: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 51
- Nays: 21
- Present/NV: 8
May 18, 2021: r/favorably
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
March 15, 2021: r/ACS
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor