+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (10)
On May 12, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Approved P.L.2021, c.93.
On March 25, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (73-0-0)
On February 22, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
On February 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed by the Senate (34-0)
- Substituted for S2855 (1R)
On December 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
On October 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
On September 24, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Passed by the Assembly (79-0-0)
On August 10, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
On June 8, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
+ − Votes (6)
March 25, 2021: CONCUR IN SA
- Yeas: 73
- Present/NV: 6
February 19, 2021: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 6
February 19, 2021: SUB FOR S2855
- Present/NV: 40
December 7, 2020: r/Sca
- Yeas: 8
September 24, 2020: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 79
- Present/NV: 1
August 10, 2020: r/Aca
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor