+ − Full Texts (10)
+ − Actions (12)
On August 24, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Approved P.L.2018, c.115.
On June 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (51-21-2)
On June 25, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
On June 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed by the Senate (37-0)
- Emergency Resolution (35-0) (Kean)
- Senate Amendment (36-0) (Kean)
- Substituted for S2730 (2R)
- Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
On June 25, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Passed by the Assembly (53-22-2)
On June 21, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)
On June 18, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
- Introduced, Referred to Assembly Budget Committee
+ − Votes (8)
June 30, 2018: CONCUR IN SA
- Yeas: 51
- Nays: 21
- Present/NV: 6
June 25, 2018: SUB FOR S2730
- Present/NV: 40
June 25, 2018: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 53
- Nays: 22
- Present/NV: 2
June 25, 2018: 2ND READING
- Present/NV: 40
June 25, 2018: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 3
June 25, 2018: AMEND
- Yeas: 36
- Present/NV: 4
June 25, 2018: EMERGENCY
- Yeas: 35
- Present/NV: 5
June 18, 2018: r/Aca
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 4
+ − Sponsors (7)
Type:
Primary Sponsor