+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (5)
On May 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
On May 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
On March 23, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Passed by the Assembly (71-0-2)
On January 12, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
On September 19, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee
+ − Votes (3)
May 15, 2017: r/Sca
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
March 23, 2017: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 71
- Present/NV: 7
January 12, 2017: r/favorably
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 3