+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (8)
On May 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
- Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
- Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
On March 16, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Passed by the Assembly (64-6-3)
On February 15, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Substitution (Lagana)
On January 30, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
On December 12, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
On September 19, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
+ − Votes (3)
May 1, 2017: r/favorably
- Yeas: 5
March 16, 2017: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 64
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 7
January 30, 2017: r/favorably
- Yeas: 10