+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (8)
On November 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Approved P.L.2015, c.150.
On September 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (25-12)
- Substituted for S2755
On July 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
On May 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
On May 14, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Passed by the Assembly (52-16-3)
On March 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
On February 5, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
+ − Votes (5)
September 24, 2015: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 3
September 24, 2015: SUBSTITUTE FOR S2755
- Present/NV: 40
July 20, 2015: r/favorably
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
May 14, 2015: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 52
- Nays: 16
- Present/NV: 9
March 2, 2015: r/favorably
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor