+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (8)
On August 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Approved P.L.2018, c.118.
On June 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (38-0)
- Substituted for S233
- Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
On June 21, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Passed by the Assembly (71-0-4)
On June 18, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
- Transferred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
On June 4, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
+ − Votes (4)
June 25, 2018: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
June 25, 2018: SUB FOR S233
- Present/NV: 40
June 21, 2018: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 71
- Present/NV: 4
June 19, 2018: r/Aca
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 4
+ − Sponsors (17)
Type:
Primary Sponsor