+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (10)
On January 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Approved P.L.2017, c.373.
On January 8, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (67-0-0)
- Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
On January 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed by the Senate (36-0)
On January 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
- Transferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
On January 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
On December 19, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Passed by the Assembly (77-0-0)
On September 19, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
On September 15, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee
+ − Votes (5)
January 8, 2018: CONCUR IN SA
- Yeas: 67
- Present/NV: 13
January 8, 2018: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 36
- Present/NV: 4
January 5, 2018: r/Sca
- Yeas: 11
- Present/NV: 2
December 19, 2016: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 3
September 19, 2016: r/favorably
- Yeas: 6