+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (7)
On September 24, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Substituted by S2400 (3R)
On September 21, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
- Transferred to Assembly Budget Committee
On September 14, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Recommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee
On June 1, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
- Transferred to Assembly Budget Committee
On May 4, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Introduced, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
+ − Votes (2)
September 22, 2020: r/Aca
- Yeas: 13
June 1, 2020: r/favorably
- Yeas: 9