+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (8)
On May 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Approved P.L.2017, c.84.
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (38-0)
- Substituted for S2491
On January 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
On December 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
On November 21, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Passed by the Assembly (72-0-0)
On November 14, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
On June 30, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
+ − Votes (5)
February 13, 2017: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
February 13, 2017: SUBSTITUTE FOR S2491
- Present/NV: 40
January 12, 2017: r/favorably
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 1
November 21, 2016: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 72
- Present/NV: 7
November 14, 2016: r/favorably
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor