+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (5)
On September 24, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Substituted by S2785 (SCS)
On August 24, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
- Reported as an Assembly Committee Substitute and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
On August 13, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Transferred to Assembly Aging and Senior Services Committee
On May 4, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
+ − Votes (2)
August 24, 2020: r/favorably
- Yeas: 11
August 21, 2020: r/ACS
- Yeas: 6
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor