+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (10)
On January 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- Approved P.L.2020, c.156.
On December 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (38-1)
On December 21, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Motion To Table (22-15) (Weinberg)
- Motion To Sa (O'Scanlon)
- Substituted for S3295 (1R)
- Passed by the Assembly (68-11-0)
- Motion To Table (51-28-0) (Greenwald)
- Motion To Aa (DiMaso)
On December 17, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
On December 16, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Introduced, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
+ − Votes (6)
December 21, 2020: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 68
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 1
December 21, 2020: MOTION TAB MOTION
- Yeas: 51
- Nays: 28
- Present/NV: 1
December 21, 2020: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 38
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
December 21, 2020: SUB FOR S3295
- Present/NV: 40
December 21, 2020: TABLE MOTION
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 15
- Present/NV: 3
December 18, 2020: r/Aca
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 4
+ − Sponsors (24)
Type:
Primary Sponsor