+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (12)
On January 7, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (29-6)
On December 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading - Concur. w/Gov's Recom.
On December 17, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Passed by the Assembly (43-23-3)
On November 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- 2nd Reading in the Assembly on Concur. w/Gov.'s Recommend.
- First Reading/Governor Recommendations Only
- Conditional Veto, Received in the Assembly
On June 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (34-5)
- Substituted for S2572 (2R)
On June 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
On June 11, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Passed by the Assembly (52-20-2)
On December 15, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
- Introduced, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
+ − Votes (6)
January 7, 2016: CONCUR GOV REC
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 5
December 17, 2015: CONCUR GOV REC
- Yeas: 43
- Nays: 23
- Present/NV: 10
June 25, 2015: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 1
June 25, 2015: SUBSTITUTE FOR S2572
- Present/NV: 40
June 11, 2015: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 52
- Nays: 20
- Present/NV: 6
December 15, 2014: r/favorably
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3