+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (6)
On June 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Substituted by S1403 (5R)
On May 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)
On March 18, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
- Recommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee
On March 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
On May 17, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
+ − Vote
March 18, 2019: r/Aca
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor