+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (7)
On November 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Approved P.L.2021, c.291.
On June 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (38-0)
- Substituted for S3263 (1R)
On June 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
On May 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Passed by the Assembly (70-0-0)
On January 27, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
On March 23, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture Committee
+ − Votes (4)
June 21, 2021: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
June 21, 2021: SUB FOR S3263
- Present/NV: 40
May 20, 2021: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 70
- Present/NV: 10
January 27, 2021: r/favorably
- Yeas: 6
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor