+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (10)
On October 13, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Approved P.L.2015, c.115.
On June 11, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (74-0-0)
On June 1, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
On May 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed by the Senate (35-0)
- Substituted for S2754 (2R)
On March 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Senate Amendment (26-0) (Gordon)
On March 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
On March 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Passed by the Assembly (76-0-0)
On January 12, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
On December 4, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
+ − Votes (7)
June 11, 2015: CONCUR IN SA
- Yeas: 74
- Present/NV: 6
May 18, 2015: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 35
- Present/NV: 5
May 18, 2015: SUBSTITUTE FOR S2754
- Present/NV: 40
March 16, 2015: 2ND READING
- Present/NV: 40
March 16, 2015: AMEND
- Yeas: 26
- Present/NV: 14
March 9, 2015: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 4
January 12, 2015: r/Aca
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor