+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (8)
On January 13, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (37-2)
- Substituted for S2501 (1R)
On January 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
On December 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
On November 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Passed by the Assembly (73-0-0)
On November 14, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
On December 3, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
On May 7, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
+ − Votes (5)
January 13, 2020: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 37
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
January 13, 2020: SUB FOR S2501
- Present/NV: 40
January 6, 2020: r/favorably
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 1
November 25, 2019: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 73
- Present/NV: 7
November 14, 2019: r/Aca
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor