+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On January 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Approved P.L.2017, c.270.
On December 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (36-0)
- Substituted for S3339
On December 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
On June 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
On June 22, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Passed by the Assembly (72-0-3)
On June 1, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
On June 2, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
+ − Votes (5)
December 18, 2017: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 36
- Present/NV: 4
December 18, 2017: SUBSTITUTE FOR S3339
- Present/NV: 40
December 4, 2017: r/favorably
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 4
June 22, 2017: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 72
- Present/NV: 5
June 1, 2017: r/favorably
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (7)
Type:
Primary Sponsor