+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (5)
On June 29, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Substituted by S2085 (1R)
On June 25, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
- Recommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee
On June 18, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
On March 5, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
+ − Votes (2)
June 26, 2020: r/Aca
- Yeas: 11
June 17, 2020: r/favorably
- Yeas: 6
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor