+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (9)
On December 20, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
On December 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- Passed by the Senate (37-0)
- Substituted for S2899 (SS)
On December 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Senate Amendment (34-0) (Cruz-Perez)
On November 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
On January 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
On December 19, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Passed by the Assembly (65-0-12)
On November 14, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
On April 14, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
+ − Votes (7)
December 18, 2017: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 3
December 18, 2017: SUBSTITUTE FOR S2899
- Present/NV: 40
December 7, 2017: 2ND READING
- Present/NV: 40
December 7, 2017: AMEND
- Yeas: 34
- Present/NV: 6
November 30, 2017: r/favorably
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 1
December 19, 2016: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 65
- Present/NV: 3
November 14, 2016: r/Aca
- Yeas: 3