+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (5)
On May 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
On May 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Passed by the Assembly (77-0-0)
On May 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
On June 14, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
On March 12, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
+ − Votes (3)
May 23, 2019: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 3
May 20, 2019: r/Aca
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 1
June 14, 2018: r/favorably
- Yeas: 6
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor