+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (5)
On January 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
On November 19, 2020 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
On November 16, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Passed by the Assembly (74-0-0)
On October 8, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
On March 5, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
+ − Votes (3)
January 14, 2021: r/favorably
- Yeas: 5
November 16, 2020: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 74
- Present/NV: 6
October 8, 2020: r/Aca
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (7)
Type:
Primary Sponsor