+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (8)
On December 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Approved P.L.2016, c.79.
On October 20, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (38-0)
- Substituted for S2439
On September 12, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
On April 18, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
On April 7, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Passed by the Assembly (73-0-0)
On March 3, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
On February 22, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
+ − Votes (5)
October 20, 2016: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
October 20, 2016: SUBSTITUTE FOR S2439
- Present/NV: 40
September 12, 2016: r/favorably
- Yeas: 3
- Present/NV: 2
April 7, 2016: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 73
- Present/NV: 7
March 3, 2016: r/Aca
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor