+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (5)
On February 14, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Substituted by S2211 (1R)
- Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Singleton)
On December 13, 2012 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
On December 6, 2012 in the Assembly:
- Transferred to Assembly Budget Committee
On September 27, 2012 in the Assembly:
- Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
+ − Vote
December 11, 2012: r/Aca
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor