+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (11)
On July 15, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Approved P.L.2019, c.162.
On May 23, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (77-0-0)
On May 13, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed by the Senate (39-0)
- Substituted for S2244 (1R)
On March 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
On June 14, 2018 in the Senate:
- Transferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
On April 5, 2018 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
On March 26, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Passed by the Assembly (74-0-2)
On March 5, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
On February 12, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
+ − Votes (6)
May 23, 2019: CONCUR IN SA
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 3
March 25, 2019: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
March 25, 2019: SUB FOR S2244
- Present/NV: 40
March 18, 2019: r/Sca
- Yeas: 12
March 26, 2018: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 74
- Present/NV: 3
March 5, 2018: r/favorably
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (23)
Type:
Primary Sponsor