+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (9)
On June 13, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
On June 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Passed by the Senate (26-8)
- Substituted for S2419 (2R)
On May 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Senate Amendment (30-0) (Smith)
On May 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
On March 25, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Passed by the Assembly (68-8-1)
On June 21, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)
On February 12, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
On February 8, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
+ − Votes (6)
June 10, 2019: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 6
June 10, 2019: SUB FOR S2419
- Present/NV: 40
May 30, 2019: 2ND READING
- Present/NV: 40
May 30, 2019: AMEND
- Yeas: 30
- Present/NV: 10
March 25, 2019: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 68
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 3
February 12, 2018: r/favorably
- Yeas: 5