+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (7)
On September 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly
On May 30, 2013 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (36-4)
- Substituted for S2152 (1R)
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
On May 20, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Passed by the Assembly (68-10-0)
On February 7, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
On September 24, 2012 in the Assembly:
- Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee
+ − Votes (4)
May 30, 2013: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 36
- Nays: 4
May 30, 2013: SUBSTITUTE FOR S2152
- Present/NV: 40
May 20, 2013: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 68
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 2
February 7, 2013: r/Aca
- Yeas: 9