+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (9)
On May 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- Approved P.L.2015, c.50.
On March 16, 2015 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (39-0)
- Substituted for S2026 (1R)
On September 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
On June 23, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
On June 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Passed by the Assembly (77-0-0)
On June 16, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Gusciora)
On June 12, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
On May 15, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee
+ − Votes (5)
March 16, 2015: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
March 16, 2015: SUBSTITUTE FOR S2026
- Present/NV: 40
September 18, 2014: r/favorably
- Yeas: 4
June 23, 2014: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 3
June 12, 2014: r/favorably
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 1