+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (8)
On January 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
On January 8, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (37-0)
- Substituted for S2127
On December 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
- Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
On December 7, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Passed by the Assembly (69-0-0)
On June 15, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
On February 16, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
+ − Votes (5)
January 8, 2018: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 3
January 8, 2018: SUBSTITUTE FOR S2127
- Present/NV: 40
December 11, 2017: r/favorably
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 1
December 7, 2017: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 69
- Present/NV: 11
June 15, 2017: r/favorably
- Yeas: 5
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor