+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (10)
On August 28, 2020 in the Senate:
- Approved P.L.2020, c.69.
On July 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (39-0)
- Substituted for S1591
On July 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
- Transferred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
On June 25, 2020 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
On June 18, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Passed by the Assembly (78-0-0)
On June 15, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
- Transferred to Assembly Budget Committee
On January 14, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Introduced, Referred to Assembly Oversight, Reform and Federal Relations Committee
+ − Votes (5)
July 30, 2020: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
July 30, 2020: SUB FOR S1591
- Present/NV: 40
July 22, 2020: r/favorably
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 1
June 18, 2020: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 2
June 16, 2020: r/favorably
- Yeas: 13