+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (6)
On August 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
On July 30, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Passed by the Assembly (74-0-0)
On July 27, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
- Recommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee
On February 13, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
On February 3, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture Committee
+ − Votes (3)
July 30, 2020: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 74
- Present/NV: 6
July 27, 2020: r/Aca
- Yeas: 11
February 13, 2020: r/favorably
- Yeas: 6
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor