+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (13)
On October 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- Approved P.L.2018, c.123.
On September 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (28-11)
- Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading - Concur. w/Gov's Recom.
On September 27, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Passed by the Assembly (56-23-0)
On August 27, 2018 in the Assembly:
- 2nd Reading in the Assembly on Concur. w/Gov.'s Recommend.
- First Reading/Governor Recommendations Only
- Conditional Veto, Received in the Assembly
On June 25, 2018 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (26-11)
- Substituted for S342 (1R)
- Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
On June 21, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Passed by the Assembly (55-22-0)
On June 14, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
On February 1, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
+ − Votes (6)
September 27, 2018: CONCUR GOV REC
- Yeas: 56
- Nays: 23
- Present/NV: 1
September 27, 2018: CONCUR GOV REC
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 1
June 25, 2018: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 3
June 25, 2018: SUB FOR S342
- Present/NV: 40
June 21, 2018: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 55
- Nays: 22
- Present/NV: 2
June 14, 2018: r/Aca
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3