+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (5)
On April 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
On March 25, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Passed by the Assembly (72-0-0)
On March 17, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
On February 13, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Reported as an Assembly Committee Substitute and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
On January 14, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
+ − Votes (3)
March 25, 2021: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 72
- Present/NV: 7
March 17, 2021: r/favorably
- Yeas: 11
February 13, 2020: r/ACS
- Yeas: 6
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor