+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (8)
On September 19, 2012 in the Senate:
- Approved P.L.2012, c.59.
On June 25, 2012 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (37-0)
- Substituted for S318 (1R)
On June 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
On May 31, 2012 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
On May 24, 2012 in the Assembly:
- Passed by the Assembly (77-0-0)
On May 10, 2012 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
On March 15, 2012 in the Assembly:
- Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Local Government Committee
+ − Votes (5)
June 25, 2012: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 3
June 25, 2012: SUBSTITUTE FOR S318
- Present/NV: 40
June 7, 2012: r/favorably
- Yeas: 5
May 24, 2012: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 3
May 10, 2012: r/Aca
- Yeas: 6