+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (7)
On December 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (39-0)
- Substituted for S4209
On December 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
On June 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
On May 20, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Passed by the Assembly (76-0-0)
On February 24, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
On February 13, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
+ − Votes (5)
December 20, 2021: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
December 20, 2021: SUB FOR S4209
- Present/NV: 40
December 6, 2021: r/favorably
- Yeas: 5
May 20, 2021: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 4
February 24, 2021: r/favorably
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1