+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (12)
On October 11, 2012 in the Assembly:
- 2nd Reading in the Assembly on Concur. w/Gov.'s Recommend.
- First Reading/Governor Recommendations Only
On September 24, 2012 in the Assembly:
- Conditional Veto, Received in the Assembly
On June 21, 2012 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (23-12)
- Substituted for S1933
On June 7, 2012 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
On May 3, 2012 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
On March 15, 2012 in the Assembly:
- Passed by the Assembly (49-26-4)
On March 12, 2012 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
- Recommitted to Assembly Labor Committee
On March 8, 2012 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
On March 5, 2012 in the Assembly:
- Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee
+ − Votes (5)
June 21, 2012: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 5
June 21, 2012: SUBSTITUTE FOR S1933
- Present/NV: 40
June 7, 2012: r/favorably
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 1
March 15, 2012: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 49
- Nays: 26
- Present/NV: 1
March 8, 2012: r/favorably
- Yeas: 6
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor