+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (8)
On February 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Approved P.L.2017, c.22.
On December 19, 2016 in the Senate:
- Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (37-0)
- Substituted for S2008
On December 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
On July 14, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
On June 30, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Passed by the Assembly (76-0-0)
On March 3, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
On February 4, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
+ − Votes (5)
December 19, 2016: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 3
December 19, 2016: SUBSTITUTE FOR S2008
- Present/NV: 40
December 5, 2016: r/favorably
- Yeas: 5
June 30, 2016: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 4
March 3, 2016: r/favorably
- Yeas: 6
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor