+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (5)
On June 30, 2016 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
On June 27, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Passed by the Assembly (73-4-0)
On June 16, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)
On May 12, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
On February 4, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Introduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
+ − Votes (2)
June 27, 2016: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 73
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 3
May 12, 2016: r/Aca
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor