+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (11)
On September 30, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Approved P.L.2021, c.243.
On June 3, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (72-0-0)
- Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
On June 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Passed by the Senate (38-0)
- Substituted for S1078 (1R)
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Senate Amendment (25-0) (Greenstein)
On February 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
On June 30, 2020 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
On June 29, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Passed by the Assembly (73-0-0)
On March 5, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
On January 27, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Introduced, Referred to Assembly Aging and Senior Services Committee
+ − Votes (8)
June 3, 2021: SUB FOR S1078
- Present/NV: 40
June 3, 2021: CONCUR IN SA
- Yeas: 72
- Present/NV: 8
June 3, 2021: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
March 25, 2021: 2ND READING
- Present/NV: 40
March 25, 2021: AMEND
- Yeas: 25
- Present/NV: 15
February 9, 2021: r/favorably
- Yeas: 8
June 29, 2020: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 73
- Present/NV: 7
March 5, 2020: r/favorably
- Yeas: 6
+ − Sponsors (26)
Type:
Primary Sponsor