+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (7)
On December 15, 2014 in the Senate:
- Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading without recommendation
On December 1, 2014 in the Senate:
- Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
On November 13, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Passed by the Assembly (41-31-0)
On June 23, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Greenwald)
On June 16, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Riley)
On June 5, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
On February 6, 2014 in the Assembly:
- Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
+ − Votes (3)
December 15, 2014: r w/o rec.
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
November 13, 2014: 3RDG FINAL PASSAGE
- Yeas: 41
- Nays: 31
- Present/NV: 8
June 5, 2014: r/Aca
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 4